HI HB580 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes mental health professionals who have not yet achieved licensure but are working under the supervision of a licensed mental health professional to provide mental health treatment or counseling services to minors. (HB580 HD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka, Ward. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka, Ward. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB580 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4).
SB538 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB538 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.