HI HB603 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and sets forth procedures for impounding a motor vehicle if a person operating the vehicle fails to display a valid insurance card.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
SB110 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
SB110 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=603&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB603_.HTM |