HI HB612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fines for any county that fails to comply with any provision of Hawaii's abandoned vehicles law or any lawful rule adopted by the Director of Finance under the authority of the law. Requires the Department of Taxation to collect and deposit the fines into the general fund.
Title
Relating To Abandoned Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB612 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=612&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB612_.HTM |