HI HB613 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the sunset clause provisions in section 5 of Act 227, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB613 HD1)
Title
Insurance Provider Bundling; Sunset Clause
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 138). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Herkes, Fontaine, Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Marumoto. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-11 2:30PM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 29 | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 75), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-28-11 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB730 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.