HI HB613 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits and controls the ways in which a computer service provider working with the DOE can use student data. (HB613 HD1)
Title
Student data; Computer services
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EDU, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 431), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Ito. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |