HI HB619 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 269, on 7/8/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates feeding of feral birds as a nuisance, which the director of health is authorized to examine and order to be abated, destroyed, removed, or prevented. Allows the public to report a nuisance to the department of health. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feral Birds; Nuisances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09HouseAct 269, on 7/8/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
2013-07-09SenateAct 269, 7/8/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 787).
2013-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2013-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-05-02HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kidani, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 242).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Fale, Jordan, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Evans, Hanohano voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Fale voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley, McDermott.
2013-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2013-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-13.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback