HI HB624 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 056, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Purpose section. Part II: Establishes the strategic development programs revolving fund and transfers powers, duties, and programs of the Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation (HSDC) under Hawaii Technology Development Corporation (HTDC). Part III: Makes conforming amendments. Part IV: Repeals HSDC and transfers all duties, employees, rules, records, and equipment from HSDC to HTDC. Part V: Lowers the cap on the technology special fund and transfers unencumbered balances to the general fund. Part VI: Appropriates funds for HSDC to transfer assets and continue the strategic development programs within HTDC. (HB624 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Structure Of Government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 056, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
2019-06-12HouseAct 056, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888).
2019-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970).
2019-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-04-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-19.
2019-04-30SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 203).
2019-04-30HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday 05-02-19.
2019-04-30HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 203) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kim, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, McKelvey, Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 12:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kim, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 888) in amended form (SD 3).
2019-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19.
2019-04-09SenateReport filed.
2019-04-09SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
2019-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 14 offered.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2051) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-19 1:40PM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EET/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on EET/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to EET/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TEC/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 64).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Perruso, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from LHE/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan, Tokioka.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE/EDB on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to LHE/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback