HI HB627 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB627
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires noncandidate committees and other persons who make independent expenditures supporting or opposing a candidate to report expenditures in support or opposition. Requires the Campaign Spending Commission to post independent expenditure information for each candidate on the Commission's website. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 955). |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Discharged. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 765) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB627 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 955).