HI HB628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB628
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects the service retirement allowance, ordinary disability retirement allowance, and service-connected disability retirement allowance, as adjusted by any post retirement allowances, of employees who become contributory, non-contributory, and hybrid plan members in ERS after 12/31/2019, to a maximum amount of 75% of the governor's salary as last recommended by the executive salary commission at the time of the member's retirement.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB628 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=628&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB628_.HTM |