HI HB635 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 264, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the State and the counties to take action within sixty days for broadband-related permit applications, or the application will be deemed approved. Requires the State to take action within one hundred forty-five days for use applications for broadband facilities within the conservation district, or the application will be deemed approved. Establishes other requirements regarding broadband-related permits. Subjects weight load for utility poles to capacities established by the Federal Communications Commission and public utilities commission. Effective January 1, 2014. Repeals on June 30, 2018. (HB635 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Permits; Automatic Approval; Construction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 264, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
2013-07-09HouseAct 264, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
2013-05-06HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Ing, Lowen, Thielen, Wooley voting no (5) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 58).
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 58) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Hee, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, McKelvey, Choy, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-24-13at 2:45 PM in Conference Room 016.
2013-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Baker, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Espero, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Tsuji, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Choy, Yamashita, Ward.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 509) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1321) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN/JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-03-13 10:15AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDL.
2013-03-22SenateReported from TEC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDL.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green.
2013-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to TEC/PSM, CPN/JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 244).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-25HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-20HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
2013-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
2013-02-12HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2013-02-05HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB941 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDL.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback