HI HB636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB636
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits operating a moped or motor scooter from any rental company unless the person wears a safety helmet that the rental company is required to provide or the person wears a safety helmet that is provided by the person; provided that this requirement does not apply to any person who possesses a valid license from any state to operate a motorcycle. Prohibits the rental of any moped or motor scooter with an aftermarket modification to its motor.
Title
Relating To Rentals Of Mopeds And Motor Scooters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB824 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
SB824 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
Subjects
Aftermarket Motor Modification
Helmet Requirements
Lexi's Law
Mopeds
Motor Scooters
Rental Companies
Violation
Helmet Requirements
Lexi's Law
Mopeds
Motor Scooters
Rental Companies
Violation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=636&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB636_.HTM |