HI HB65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 226, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 226, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that an otherwise qualified retail community pharmacy that requests to enter into a contractual retail pharmacy network agreement shall be considered part of a pharmacy benefit manager's retail pharmacy network for purposes of a beneficiary's right to choose where to purchase covered prescription drugs. Requires specified entities to permit beneficiaries to fill any covered prescription that may be obtained by mail order at any pharmacy of the beneficiary's choice within the pharmacy benefit manager's retail pharmacy network. Requires specified entities to file an annual report with the insurance commissioner disclosing certain amounts, terms, and conditions associated with a prescription drug benefit plan. Requires affected entities to report to the legislature prior to the regular sessions of 2014 and 2015. Prohibits application to community retail pharmacies with a rural pharmacy designation. (CD1)
Title
Prescription Drugs; Prescription Drug Benefits; Retail Community Pharmacy; Retail Pharmacy Network; Mail Order Pharmacy; Opt Out
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 226, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 226, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Rhoads, Evans, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 4:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 2:05PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Evans, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 469) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Evans, Har, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 at 8:30am. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-08-13 8:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 13 |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |