HI HB652 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 184, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 184, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits remote dispensing pharmacies from operating within the State, excepting the two existing remote dispensing pharmacies operated by the Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center in Nanakuli and Waianae until June 1, 2014. Extends the repeal date of Act 212, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, to January 1, 2016. (HB652 CD1)
Title
Pharmacies; Remote Dispensing Pharmacies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 184, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 184, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 67). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 67) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-13 at 5:15PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 743), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HTH, CPN.