HI HB652 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB652
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state income tax credit for certain expenses paid or incurred by school teachers, special education teachers, school librarians, and counselors for supplementary materials used in the classroom, as well as expenses incurred while accompanying students on educational trips.
Title
Relating To Teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB652 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=652&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB652_.HTM |