HI HB653 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 127, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 127, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds for Hawaii Pacific Health. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB653 CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Hawaii Pacific Health ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 127, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 127, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 109). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 717). |
2013-04-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2013-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-13. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1121) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 102). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 54), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HTH, CPN.