HI HB653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that land court actions for partition by the State be given priority. (HB653 HD1)
Title
Relating To State Partitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 44) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB653 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.