HI HB654 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the membership of the center of nursing advisory board to include three members that are representatives of professional organization relating to health rather than from the Hawaii Nurses' Association. Requires the department of commerce and consumer affairs professional and vocational licensing division to collaborate with the center for nursing to enable the center to obtain nursing-related data. Provides that the workforce data may be obtained through online survey or other means. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing-Related Data; Nursing; Licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
2013-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 750).
2013-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2).
2013-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 737).
2013-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-04-25SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 735).
2013-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-13.
2013-04-24HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Kidani, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Brower, Fukumoto.
2013-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 459).
2013-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 449) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Green, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-13.
2013-04-03SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2013-03-21SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2013-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani.
2013-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to HRE, CPN.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 248).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-27HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har, C. Lee.
2013-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
2013-02-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2013-02-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
2013-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB490 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback