HI HB655 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed (SD1) on 07-09-19 - (SD1) Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of September of each year as Suicide Prevention and Awareness Month. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed (SD1) on 07-09-19 - (SD1) Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (SD1) (Gov. Msg. No. 1375).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto (SD1) dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (SD1) (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-12SenateHB655 HD1 became law without the Governor's signature, Act 036, 04/23/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
2019-06-12HouseHB655 HD1 became law without the Governor's signature, Act 036, 04/23/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
2019-04-22HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 829).
2019-04-22HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
2019-04-22HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-22SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 816).
2019-04-18HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 890) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19.
2019-04-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 11 offered.
2019-04-09SenateReconsider action taken to pass Third Reading on 04-04-19.
2019-04-09SenateReturned from the Governor to the Senate as requested (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 649).
2019-04-04SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-04-03SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1784) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 67).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback