HI HB66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB66
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the legislature to reclassify certain agricultural lands and transfer them to DHHL or OHA. Requires the value of lands transferred to OHA to be credited against OHA's pro rata share of ceded land revenues.
Title
Relating To Planning And Economic Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-26 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB66 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Land Use Reclassification
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Land Use Reclassification
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=66&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB66_.HTM |