HI HB664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 157, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 157, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the ban on sexual orientation change efforts applies to conversion therapy practices or treatments that seek to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Gender Identity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 157, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 157, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2019-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871). |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 861). |
2019-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 675) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-15-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 395). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1190) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB674 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).