HI HB667 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the food safety and security program within the Department of Agriculture. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB667 CD1)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Food Safety and Security Program
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Vetoed on 07-12-11 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, M. Oshiro, Pine, Takumi excused (4). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 119). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Fukunaga, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Tsuji, Choy, Evans, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 9:45AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 10:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 10:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-11 2:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Fukunaga, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Tsuji, Choy Co-Chairs; Evans, Hashem, Marumoto. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 491) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from AGL/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Re-Referred to AGL/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to AGL/EDT, HTH. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 17 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |