HI HB669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB669
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits medical malpractice liability for residents and fellows in accredited post graduate residency and fellowship programs acting under the supervision of a licensed physician.
Title
Relating To Medical Malpractice.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB669 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB825 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB825 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.