HI HB670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB670
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Re-referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Re-referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year pilot program on the island of Oahu to reduce recidivism through intervention, prevention, cultural support, and education initiatives. Appropriates funds. (HB670 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Re-referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 203) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB670 (Carry Over) 2019-02-19 - Re-referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 23