HI HB672 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 227, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 227, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and purchase of electronic smoking devices to minors under eighteen years of age. Requires retailers to sell tobacco only in a direct face-to-face exchange between the retailer and consumer, except for in-bond concessions (duty-free retail), retail tobacco stores, bars, or establishments where the minimum age for admission is eighteen. (HB672 CD1)
Title
Tobacco; Electronic Smoking Device; Minors; Sale or Purchase Prohibited; Tobacco Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 227, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 227, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Kawakami voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 124). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Brower. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Nishihara, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Onishi Co-Chairs; Brower, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 513) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1257) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Evans, Har, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 at 8:30am. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB652 (Same As) 2013-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).