HI HB69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Raises the threshold under the contractor licensing law's handyman exemption from $1,000 to $1,500 and makes it applicable only to the cost of labor and materials. (HB69 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Contractors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 334).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to CPC, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB767 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 283, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1403).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback