HI HB694 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the temporary increase in income tax rates established by Act 60, SLH 2009, one year ahead of schedule by changing the sunset date of the increased tax rates from 12/31/2015 to 12/31/2014. Changes income tax rates after 12/31/2014. Effective 01/01/2030. (SD1)
Title
Taxation; Income Tax Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Kidani, Kouchi, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Ing, Nishimoto, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 516) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 260). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cabanilla, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Ito, Jordan, Kawakami, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamane voting no (16) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |