HI HB695 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB695
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on TIA/WLH/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on TIA/WLH/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the design and construction of a new stadium. Requires a one-third private sector funding match. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on TIA/WLH/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA/WLH/EDB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TIA/WLH/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB695 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on TIA/WLH/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=695&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB695_.HTM |