HI HB697 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB697
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, requires all public, private, and charter schools in the State to establish a program within the health education curriculum for students grades nine through twelve to provide instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation. Specifies instruction requirements. Waives liability for instruction under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB697 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB1388 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
SB1388 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=697&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB697_.HTM |