HI HB699 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the Hawaii Public Housing Authority (HPHA) to evict a tenant convicted of a felony committed during the term of the tenancy and related to the HPHA's property or funds or its employees and their property. (HB699 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, Mizuno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Mizuno, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 770) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1951) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HOU, JDC.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 69).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 891), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura excused (1).
2019-02-11HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback