HI HB702 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1376).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or offering for sale of location data collected using satellite navigation technology without the explicit consent of the individual who is the primary user of the satellite navigation technology-equipped device. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Satellite Navigation Technology.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1376). |
2019-07-09 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1376). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887). |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Gates, Har, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, Ohno, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Todd, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (17) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-19. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 771) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 70). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 310) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |