HI HB706 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that each parking space designated for an electric vehicle shall count as four parking spaces available for public use towards any city or county requirements regarding number of total public use parking spaces. Establishes notification requirements and fines for noncompliance.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB706 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EEP/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=706&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB706_.HTM |