HI HB713 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a three-year Homeless Employment Grant Program that provides homeless individuals with work opportunities and connects them with service providers. Requires the Department of Human Services to submit a report to the Legislature prior to the 2020 Regular Session. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 1/1/2059. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homelessness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Johanson, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 775) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1973) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 71).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:46AM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HSH, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-24HouseReferred to HSH/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback