HI HB725 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates unspecified amounts to the University of Hawaii to hire a Program Coordinator and a technical support staff member for the proposed International Flight Training Center and associated degree programs at the University of Hawaii at Hilo and Hawaii Community College. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB725 HD2)
Title
Appropriation; International Flight Training Center; Aeronautical Training Programs; University of Hawaii ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 265). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1221 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Act 272, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1378).