HI HB725 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB725
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits public school students' participation in standardized tests and provides notice to students and parents or guardians of the opportunity to opt out of standardized tests. (HB725 HD1)
Title
Relating To Standardized Testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB725 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).