HI HB726 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB726
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state income tax credit for certain expenses incurred by prekindergarten through twelfth-grade teachers, instructors, school librarians, counselors, principals, registrars, or aides in a school. (HB726 HD1)
Title
Relating To A Teacher Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).