HI HB749 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 099, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 099, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Agriculture Workforce Advisory Board to promote agricultural self-sufficiency in the State. (HB749 CD1)
Title
Agriculture; Hawaii Agriculture Workforce Advisory Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 099, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 099, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Wooley, Hashem, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:15PM in Conference Room 325. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Hee, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Wooley, Hashem Co-Chairs; Takumi, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from AGL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AGL/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 269). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/AGR on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-29 | House | Re-referred to LAB/AGR, FIN referral sheet 8 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |