HI HB761 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that retailers may provide proof of purchase in electronic form to a member of a frequent shopper program. Requires retailers who offer electronic proof of purchase to have reasonable safeguards to protect members' personal information. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 781) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1881) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 76).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDB, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback