HI HB762 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a full-service restaurant from providing a single-use plastic straw to a consumer unless requested by the consumer. Takes effect on 7/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Single-use Plastic Straws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB762 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
SB1290 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
SB1290 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.