HI HB763 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies the composition and quorum of the Hawaii State Building Code Council and revises the State Building Code. Authorizes the Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund to provide funding for the State Building Code Council for activities that are a part of a loss reduction plan. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB763 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii State Building Code; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-08-13 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
2013-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 137).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 137) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hashem, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Ruderman, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Cheape.
2013-04-15HouseRe-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from PSM/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 9:55AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateRe-Referred to PSM/WAM.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2013-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 149).
2013-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-02-20HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-24HouseReferred to WAL, referral sheet 5
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB999 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to PSM, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback