HI HB785 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 77, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 77, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "qualified Native Hawaiian" to include individuals who meet certain expanded ancestry requirements. Specifies that the Native Hawaiian Roll Commission is responsible for certifying as qualified Native Hawaiians for enrollment purposes all individuals already registered as Hawaiians or Native Hawaiians through the Office of Hawaiian Affairs. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB785 CD1)
Title
Native Hawaiians; Recognition; Native Hawaiian Roll Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Act 77, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2013-05-24 | House | Act 077, on 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Jordan, Thielen voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 53). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 53) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Carroll; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Carroll, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 273). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Ito. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1015 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).