HI HB787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB787
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the department of human services to restore adult dental benefits to medicaid enrollees. Requires federal matching funds.
Title
Making An Appropriation To Restore Adult Dental Benefits To Medicaid Enrollees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB787 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB467 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB467 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=787&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB787_.HTM |