HI HB790 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB790
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the minimum age requirement to enter into marriage from sixteen to eighteen years of age. Removes the parental consent and written approval by the family court requirements for a minor to marry. Requires, rather than permits, the family court to declare void the marriage contract on the ground that the parties, or either of them, had not attained the legal age of marriage at the time of the marriage. Removes spousal cohabitation after the parties attain legal age as an exception for an annulment based on nonage. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Relating To Marriage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB790 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB419 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
SB419 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=790&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB790_.HTM |