HI HB797 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB797
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires telecommunications carriers to block calls to residential phone lines and personal mobile phone lines made from telephone numbers that do not match any of the telephone numbers of certain excepted entities as a means to curb scam calls.
Title
Relating To Telecommunications Carriers.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB797 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=797&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB797_.HTM |