HI HB799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a wind resistive device tax credit for the purchase and installation of wind resistive devices in a non-condominium residential dwelling. Requires the Insurance Commissioner to develop and determine the requirements for the wind resistive devices and to certify claims for the tax credit. (HB799 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB799 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.