HI HB802 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB802
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employee to take family leave in addition to victim leave when the leave is related to domestic or sexual violence against the employee or the employee's minor child. Requires an employee to submit certification related to domestic or sexual violence of the employee or the employee's minor child. Requires employer confidentiality of information related to domestic or sexual violence against the employee or the employee's minor child.
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB/HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB802 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
SB1046 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB1046 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=802&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB802_.HTM |