HI HB808 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 252, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the existing prohibition on knowingly capturing or killing a manta ray in state marine waters to apply to all rays and to also include knowingly taking, possessing, abusing, or entangling a ray. Provides certain exemptions. (HB808 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Shark And Ray Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 252, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
2019-07-09HouseAct 252, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Nishimoto discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Tarnas, Thielen.
2019-04-15HouseRe-referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 784) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, J.Keohokalole. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1964) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 411).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB489 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback