HI HB811 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 259, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the responsibilities and powers of the Public Utilities Commission in receiving energy industry data information registrations, and authorizes the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to receive such registrations; and eliminates the Commission's powers concerning the oversight and examination of energy distributors in relation to energy industry information reporting under chapter 486J, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Industry Information Reporting Act; Public Utilities Commission; Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 259, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
2013-07-09HouseAct 259, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
2013-04-19HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-04-22SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 714).
2013-04-19HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Fukumoto, Oshiro excused (2).
2013-04-19HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-04-19SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-13.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Dela Cruz, Baker, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom.
2013-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 459).
2013-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 450) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Green, Kidani). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-13.
2013-04-03SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2013-03-22SenateReported from ENE/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English.
2013-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on ENE/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to ENE/EGH, CPN.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 281).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from EDB/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-15HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Yamane, McDermott.
2013-02-15HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka.
2013-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB/CPC on Friday, 02-15-13 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
2013-02-08HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 241) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB/CPC.
2013-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-24HouseReferred to EEP, EDB/CPC, referral sheet 5
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1041 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to ENE/EGH, CPN.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback