HI HB812 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 208, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 208, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes low-speed electric bicycles in the definition of bicycle. Prohibits anyone under the age of fifteen from operating a low-speed electric bicycle. Imposes registration fee. (HB812 CD1)
Title
Relating To Low-speed Electric Bicycles.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 208, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 208, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 85). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 85) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto, Nakamura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:25AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Hashimoto added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakamura, McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 572). |
2019-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1731) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 10:45AM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 413). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1179) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1078 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27