HI HB813 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB813
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Promise Program Plus to provide scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students enrolled in a bachelor's degree at the University of Hawaii who are (1) graduates of a University of Hawaii community college who received a Hawaii Community College Promise Program Scholarship; and (2) enrolled at any University of Hawaii campus. Appropriates funds to establish and implement the program. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program Plus.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 224). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB813 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB612 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
SB612 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HRE, WAM.