HI HB820 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 167, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to study and formulate a plan to implement an ALOHA homes program to provide low-cost, high-density leasehold homes for sale to Hawaii residents on state-owned lands within a one-half mile radius of a public transit station. Appropriates moneys. (HB820 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateAct 167, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
2019-07-03HouseAct 167, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 146).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Riviere, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:31PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:05PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matayoshi, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 786) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Kim). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee on HOU has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 226).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback